MD HB1271 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-24 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-24 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing to five the number of alcoholic beverages licenses that may be issued to a person for specified purposes; limiting the licenses that may be issued for a specified purpose; specifying that a business enterprise is not a chain store for purposes of provisions of the alcoholic beverages law under specified circumstances; repealing prohibitions against issuing licenses in specified counties to a person who holds an alcoholic beverages license issued in another state or Washington, D.C; etc.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Licenses - Chain Stores and Out-of-State
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-24 | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters Withdrawn | |
2012-03-23 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-27 | Hearing 3/26 at 3:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-24 | Re-referred Economic Matters | |
2012-02-13 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Allegany County
Anne Arundel County
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Calvert County
Charles County
Commerce and Business
Garrett County
Howard County
St. Mary's County
Washington County
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Allegany County
Anne Arundel County
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Calvert County
Charles County
Commerce and Business
Garrett County
Howard County
St. Mary's County
Washington County
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/HB1271.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/hb/hb1271f.pdf |