MD HB1268 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a Legal Education Success Collaborative for the purpose of developing methods of increasing diversity in the legal field; requiring institutions to develop and administer programs and cooperatives related to the Collaborative; beginning in fiscal year 2023, requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of $125,000 to certain institutions and programs; requiring certain institutions to provide certain matching funds; etc.
Title
Legal Education Success Collaborative - Established
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 102 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 31 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 31 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213 |
2021-04-09 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (102-36) |
2021-04-09 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {824137/1 Adopted |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation |
2021-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (100-31) |
2021-03-19 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-19 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2021-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-11 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-09 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-26 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-24 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB526 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-28 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Subjects
Appropriations
Attorneys
Education
Higher Education
Minorities
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Attorneys
Education
Higher Education
Minorities
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Universities and Colleges
Students