MD HB1268 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the definition of "lead-free" to include a specified standard for individual plumbing fittings and fixtures; allowing for a stricter federal standard for lead-free plumbing fittings and fixtures and pipes and pipe fittings; and clarifying which pipes, pipe fittings, plumbing fittings, and fixtures are considered when calculating weighted average lead content.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Business Occupations and Professions - Plumbers - Lead-Free Materials

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-10 Approved by the Governor
2012-03-30 Third Reading Passed (46-0)
2012-03-29 Second Reading Passed
2012-03-29 Favorable Report Adopted
2012-04-04 Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2012-03-28 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
2012-03-22 First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2012-04-01 Returned Passed
2012-03-22 Third Reading Passed (138-0)
2012-03-21 Second Reading Passed
2012-03-21 Favorable Report Adopted
2012-03-24 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
2012-02-28 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2012-02-27 Re-referred Economic Matters
2012-02-13 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback