MD HB1266 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 732
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program to provide strategic investment in local housing and businesses to encourage sustainable communities and to focus on areas where modest investment will have an appreciable neighborhood revitalization effect; establishing the type of project eligible to receive funds; authorizing certain government agencies, including housing authorities, and certain community development organizations to apply to receive Program funds; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Established

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (101-37) (Y: 101 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (97-38) (Y: 98 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 732
2019-04-06HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (101-37)
2019-04-06HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2019-04-05SenateFloor Amendment {183422/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
2019-04-04SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-04SenateFloor Amendment {593022/1 (Senator Zucker) Adopted
2019-04-04SenateFloor Amendment {593224/1 (Senator Patterson) Adopted
2019-04-04SenateFavorable with Amendments {924031/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-04SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
2019-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (97-38)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {924264/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2019-02-27HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
2019-02-27HouseHearing canceled (Appropriations)
2019-02-11HouseHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1266&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1266f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1266t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1266e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_732_hb1266e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/hb1266_92426401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/hb1266_59302201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/hb1266_59322401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/hb1266_92403101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/hb1266_18342201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0006/hb1266.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1266_app.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1266_ent.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0577.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1266_ehe.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1266_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1424.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1211.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback