MD HB1263 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the probationary period of employment of a certificated employee in a local school system; altering specified procedures related to the probationary period of a certificated employee; requiring a county board of education to evaluate annually a nontenured certificated employee based on established performance evaluation criteria; etc.
Title
Education Reform Act of 2010
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Mooney) {723729/1 Rejected (Y: 13 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Mooney) {723729/1 Rejected (Y: 13 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Mooney) {723729/1 Rejected (Y: 13 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Mooney) {723729/1 Rejected (Y: 13 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-09 | Third Reading Passed (44-3) | |
2010-04-09 | Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2010-04-06 | Senators Pinsky, Conway, and Rosapepe | |
2010-04-06 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2010-04-06 | Senate Refuses to Recede | |
2010-04-02 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (42-5) | |
2010-04-02 | Floor Amendment (Senator Mooney) Rejected (13-34) | |
2010-04-02 | Special Order later today (Senator Mooney) Adopted | |
2010-04-01 | Special Order 4/6 (Senator Mooney) Adopted | |
2010-04-01 | Special Order later today (Senator Mooney) Adopted | |
2010-03-31 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-31 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-25 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-04-09 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-04-08 | Third Reading Passed (140-0) | |
2010-04-08 | Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2010-04-02 | Delegates Kaiser, Olszewski, and Rice | |
2010-04-02 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2010-04-02 | House Requests Senate Recede | |
2010-04-02 | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2010-03-22 | Third Reading Passed (136-3) | |
2010-03-21 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-21 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2010-02-22 | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-18 | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Counties
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Examinations
Federal Government
Grants
Licenses
Mentors
Public Schools
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries
Students
Teachers
Unions
Work, Labor and Employment
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Examinations
Federal Government
Grants
Licenses
Mentors
Public Schools
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries
Students
Teachers
Unions
Work, Labor and Employment