MD HB1260 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a State policy that open data be machine readable and released to the public in specified ways; establishing a Council on Open Data; providing for the composition, appointment, terms, chairs, and staffing of the Council; requiring the Council to promote the policy on open data by providing specified guidance and policy recommendations, advocating for specified practices, and making recommendations on the purchase of specified data processing devices, systems, or software; etc.
Title
State Government - Open Data Policy - Council on Open Data
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-0) (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-0) (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2014-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-0) |
2014-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {696889/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-02-26 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Electronic Government
Equipment
Governor
Information Technology, Department of
Local Government - Generally
Municipal Corporations
Procurement
Public Information
Records
Reports
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - General Assembly
State Government - Procurement
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Electronic Government
Equipment
Governor
Information Technology, Department of
Local Government - Generally
Municipal Corporations
Procurement
Public Information
Records
Reports
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - General Assembly
State Government - Procurement
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Telecommunications and Information Technology