MD HB1257 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-26 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-26 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to adopt specified regulations on or before January 1, 2015; requiring the Department, if applicable, to receive specified approval from the federal Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services; requiring the Department and the Maryland Insurance Administration to establish a specified stakeholder workgroup; requiring the workgroup to conduct a specified study and make specified recommendations; etc.
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Community Health Workers - Certification and Reimbursement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2014-02-25 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
Education
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Occupations
Insurance Administration
Job Training
Licenses
Medical Assistance
Public Health
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Community Facilities and Services
Education
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Occupations
Insurance Administration
Job Training
Licenses
Medical Assistance
Public Health
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Rules and Regulations