MD HB1255 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Defining the term "bylaws" to require the bylaws of a homeowners association to be recorded among the land records of the county in which the development is located; repealing the requirement that the bylaws of a homeowners association be deposited into a specified depository; requiring a homeowners association that exists on or before September 30, 2012 to record the bylaws of the homeowners association on or before December 31, 2012; and making conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Homeowners Association Act - Bylaws Filed in Land Records

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-16 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
2012-02-13 Hearing 3/8 at 1:00 p.m.
2012-02-10 First Reading Environmental Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback