MD HB1254 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 775
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 775
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Education to disaggregate the information in any student discipline data reports by race, ethnicity, gender, disability status, eligibility for free or reduced price meals or an equivalent measure of socioeconomic status, and English language proficiency; requiring that special education data in a certain student discipline data report be disaggregated by race, ethnicity, and gender; and requiring the Department to collect certain data on alternative school discipline practices.
Title
Education – School Discipline – Data Collection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (115-21) (Y: 116 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (115-21) (Y: 116 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 775 |
2018-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (115-21) |
2018-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {515363/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Data
Discipline
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Special Education
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Discipline
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Special Education
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology