MD HB125 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-05 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-05 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from willfully and knowingly preventing, hindering, or delaying a person who has a lawful right to sign a petition from signing a petition through the use of fraud, duress, or force.
Title
Election Law - Petitions - Prohibited Actions
Sponsors
Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D] | Del. Neil Parrott [R] | Del. Kumar Barve [D] | Del. Jon Cardin [D] |
Del. Jolene Ivey [D] | Del. Michael Summers [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-0) (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-0) (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Special Order until 4/4 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) {613222/1 Adopted |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Special Order until 4/3 (Senator Dyson) Adopted |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) {613222/1 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-27 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-0) |
2014-02-25 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-02-25 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-02-24 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2014-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 2:15 p.m. |
2014-01-13 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |