MD HB1244 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each unit of State government responsible for awarding a contract for the procurement of concrete or a contract that includes the purchase or use of concrete in the performance of the contract to give a 5% price preference to the procurement, or required use under the contract, of concrete mix designs that consist of Type 1L cement or a blended cement and that meet certain specifications; providing that the 5% price preference shall only apply to a portion of the contract directly attributable to the cost of the concrete; etc.
Title
State Procurement - Concrete - Preference
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 115 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (115-19) |
2021-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {546187/1 Adopted |
2021-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2021-02-12 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Construction
Contracts
Electronic Government
internet
Prices
Procurement
Public Works, Board of
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Procurement
Weights and Measures
Construction
Contracts
Electronic Government
internet
Prices
Procurement
Public Works, Board of
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Procurement
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 417 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |