MD HB1227 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the requirements for waiver of an examination for a real estate appraiser license or a certificate to provide certified real estate appraisal services for specified applicants who are licensed or certified in another state; and repealing the requirement that the State Commission on Real Estate Appraisers and Home Inspectors may only grant a waiver of specified examination requirements for an applicant for a license or certificate if the licensing or certifying state has the same examination waiver requirement.
Title
Real Estate Appraisers - Licensing and Certification - Examination Waiver Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121 |
2015-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2015-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2015-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-18 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-18 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2015-03-17 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-04 | House | Rereferred to Economic Matters |
2015-03-02 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Appraisals
Business Regulation and Occupations
Committees and Commissions
Examinations
Interstate Affairs
Licenses
Real Estate
Business Regulation and Occupations
Committees and Commissions
Examinations
Interstate Affairs
Licenses
Real Estate