MD HB1225 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for the assumption and exercise of specified powers of the Legal Mutual Liability Insurance Society of Maryland by the Minnesota Lawyers Mutual Insurance Company (Minnesota Mutual) in a specified manner for specified purposes; appointing Minnesota Mutual as conservator of the Society for a specified period for specified purposes; providing powers to Minnesota Mutual for specified purposes; requiring Minnesota Mutual to provide specified public notice; authorizing transfer of specified assets and liabilities; etc.
Title
Legal Mutual Liability Insurance Society of Maryland - Conservatorship and Transfer
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2014-04-02 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2014-04-02 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {657770/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2014-03-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2014-03-04 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-04 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-03 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2014-02-27 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-07 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |