MD HB1215 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-12)
Status: Enrolled on April 5 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to make a certain advance payment to a nursing home at the request of the nursing home for uncompensated Maryland Medical Assistance Program services provided to a certain resident; providing that the advance payment may not exceed 50% of the estimated amount due for the uncompensated services; requiring the Department to pay the balance due to a nursing home under certain circumstances; providing for the termination of the Act; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nursing Homes - Partial Payment for Services Provided

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05HousePassed Enrolled
2018-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-04-05HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-03-30SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2018-03-29SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-29SenateFavorable with Amendments {247372/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-29SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2018-03-28SenateHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {576487/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-03-06HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-08HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1215&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1215f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1215t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1215e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0005/hb1215_57648701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0005/hb1215_24737201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0005/hb1215.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb1215_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0592.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb1215_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0967.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1107.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback