MD HB1213 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring certain credit grantors to adhere to certain rules concerning evaluations of applications and, under certain circumstances, consider alternative methods of evaluating an applicant's creditworthiness when evaluating an application for a primary residential mortgage loan or an extension of credit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Financial Institutions - Determination of Creditworthiness - Evaluation Rules and Alternative Methods

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08HouseReturned Passed
2021-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-04-06SenateSecond Reading Passed
2021-04-06SenateFavorable Adopted
2021-04-02SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2021-03-23SenateHearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-03-19SenateReferred Finance
2021-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (100-37)
2021-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {223695/1 Adopted
2021-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2021-02-09HouseHearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-02-08HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Financial Institutions1101(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions1212(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback