MD HB1212 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Workgroup to Study Enhanced Opportunities for Socially and Economically Disadvantaged Individuals in the State; requiring the Workgroup to study certain procurement preference programs, enhanced job opportunities for certain individuals, certain existing methods for enhancing opportunities in other states, the effect of additional or enhanced programs on existing State law, and other matters; requiring the Workgroup to report its findings by December 31, 2021; etc.
Title
Workgroup to Study Enhanced Opportunities for Socially and Economically Disadvantaged Individuals in the State
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 104 N: 28 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (104-28) |
2021-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {586980/1 Adopted |
2021-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2021-02-12 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Demographics
Discrimination
Ethics
Examinations
Interstate Affairs
Investigations and Inquiries
Poverty
Procurement
Public Works, Board of
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Procurement
Sunset
Work, Labor, and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Demographics
Discrimination
Ethics
Examinations
Interstate Affairs
Investigations and Inquiries
Poverty
Procurement
Public Works, Board of
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Procurement
Sunset
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |