MD HB1206 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Enrolled on April 4 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring each county board of education to convert certain student information into census tract and block numbers in a certain manner; requiring the Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center and the Comptroller to jointly develop a certain protocol for the transfer and matching of certain information to produce certain aggregated information; requiring the Center and Comptroller to jointly develop certain data privacy and security standards for the Comptroller to utilize for a certain protocol; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center - Data Matching

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (117-19) (Y: 118 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-03SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-03SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-03SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-19SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (117-19)
2019-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-14HouseSpecial Order until next session (Delegate M. Fisher) Adopted
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {105869/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-02-12HouseHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback