MD HB1205 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 407
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 407
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Insurance Administration to study and examine methods to establish and properly regulate a captive insurer industry in the State; authorizing the Administration to hire a specified consultant to assist in the study; and requiring the Administration to report on specified matters to the Governor and specified legislative committees on or before December 31, 2013.
Title
Study of Captive Insurers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-1) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-1) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 407 |
2013-04-05 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2013-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2013-04-05 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2013-04-04 | House | Special Order until 4/5 (Delegate Davis) Adopted |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {867577/1 Report Adopted |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2013-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-1) |
2013-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {733697/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2013-02-28 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Contractors
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Insurance Administration
Reports
Sunset
Consumer Protection
Contractors
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Insurance Administration
Reports
Sunset