MD HB1199 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring each county to establish a program to license certain residential rental properties on or before September 30, 2021; authorizing a county to create certain exceptions to rental property license requirements; requiring each county to establish a limit on the number of rental property licenses that may be issued; prohibiting a county from issuing new rental property licenses after a certain limit has been reached, subject to an exception for certain property that has been in continuous operation as a rental property; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Real Property - County Rental Property Licenses - Requirements and Limits

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-06HouseUnfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
2020-03-03HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Real Property14116(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback