MD HB1198 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-11 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-11 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the East Baltimore Community Recreation and Learning Center Loan of 2001 and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2005 to change the purpose of a specified grant; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - East Baltimore Community Recreation and Learning Center Loan
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-11 | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations | |
2011-03-09 | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-28 | Re-referred Appropriations | |
2011-02-17 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2011rs/billfile/HB1198.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2011rs/bills/hb/hb1198f.pdf |