MD HB1197 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-07 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-07 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a food establishment, beginning March 1, 2015, to request that a customer inform the employee taking the customer's food order of any known food allergies before ordering; providing that the request may be included on a specified sign or a menu or menu board or made by the employee taking the customer's food order; requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to make available on its Web site a list of specified food allergen awareness training courses and tests and a list of specified resources; etc.
Title
Health - Food Allergy Awareness
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (102-33) (Y: 102 N: 33 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2014-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (102-33) |
2014-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {326180/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Civil Actions
Disclosure
Diseases
District Courts
Electronic Government
Examinations
Food
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Job Training
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Public Health
Restaurants
Safety
Signs and Billboards
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Work, Labor and Employment
Disclosure
Diseases
District Courts
Electronic Government
Examinations
Food
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Job Training
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Public Health
Restaurants
Safety
Signs and Billboards
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Work, Labor and Employment