MD HB1194 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Correcting a reference to the Bowerman-Loreley Beach Community Association, Inc. for purposes of a specified property tax credit in Baltimore County; and making the Act an emergency measure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Bowerman-Loreley Beach Community Association, Inc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-16HouseVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
2013-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2013-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2013-04-02SenateSecond Reading Passed
2013-04-02SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2013-04-01SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2013-03-28SenateHearing 3/28 at 2:00 p.m.
2013-03-22SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2013-03-21HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2013-03-20HouseSecond Reading Passed
2013-03-20HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2013-03-19HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2013-03-07HouseHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2013-02-08HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback