MD HB1190 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 405
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 405
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City or the governing body of a county to set a tax rate for personal property and specified operating real property of no more than 2.5 times the county tax rate for real property.
Title
County Property Tax - Personal Property Rate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 405 |
2013-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2013-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2013-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-20 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-20 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2013-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |