MD HB1188 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "police officer" and "law enforcement officer" under specified provisions of law to clarify that the terms include members of the Maryland Capitol Police of the Department of General Services; clarifying the geographic area over which the Department of General Services has jurisdiction and full police authority for a specified purpose; specifying that the police and security force established by the Secretary of General Services is the Maryland Capitol Police of the Department of General Services; etc.
Title
Maryland Capitol Police of the Department of General Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302 |
2015-04-13 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2015-04-13 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {278778/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Zirkin) Adopted |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {278778/1 |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2015-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {292018/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2015-03-17 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-25 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2015-02-23 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Annotated Code of Maryland
Boundaries
General Services, Department of
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Names
Public Buildings and Facilities
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Work, Labor and Employment
Boundaries
General Services, Department of
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Names
Public Buildings and Facilities
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Work, Labor and Employment