MD HB1185 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB929
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-04 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-04 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person who has been convicted of a crime of violence from entering into a plea agreement; and applying the Act prospectively.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Plea Agreements - Crime of Violence
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2024-02-14 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-02-13 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB929 (Carry Over) 2019-02-11 - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Procedure | 6 | 237 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 14 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |