MD HB1182 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a specified collective bargaining agreement in Charles County to contain a grievance procedure providing for binding arbitration of the interpretation of contract terms and clauses.
Title
Charles County Sheriff - Collective Bargaining - Binding Arbitration
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2012-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-30 | Third Reading Passed (44-1) | |
2012-03-29 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2012-03-27 | Hearing 4/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-22 | First Reading Finance | |
2012-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-21 | Third Reading Passed (100-30) | |
2012-03-20 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-20 | Favorable with Amendments 944067/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | |
2012-02-29 | Hearing 3/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-10 | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Arbitration
Charles County
Collective Bargaining
Contracts
Law Enforcement
Sheriffs
Work, Labor and Employment
Charles County
Collective Bargaining
Contracts
Law Enforcement
Sheriffs
Work, Labor and Employment