MD HB1178 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 281
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 281
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Retirement Agency and the Department of Legislative Services to conduct a study regarding membership in the Employees' Pension System for specified individuals who are employed in positions for which the budgeted hours are less than 500 hours per fiscal year; requiring the study to contain specified elements; requiring the State Retirement Agency and the Department of Legislative Services to report their findings and recommendations to the Joint Committee on Pensions on or before December 1, 2017; etc.
Title
Employees' Pension System - Membership - Study
Sponsors
Del. Jeff Ghrist [R] | Del. Susan Krebs [R] | Sen. Mike McKay [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 281 |
2017-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 9:00 a.m. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 8:30 a.m. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2017-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {574362/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2017-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Legislative Services, Department of
Reports
Retirement Systems
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Legislative Services, Department of
Reports
Retirement Systems
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment