MD HB1178 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, in cooperation with the State Board of Education and the Statewide Advisory Commission on Immunizations, to adopt regulations requiring that before a child enters ninth grade, the child has received a specified number of doses of human papillomavirus vaccine.
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Immunizations of Children Entering School
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | House | Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn |
2016-03-08 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-12 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Diseases
Education, State Board of
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Immunization
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Health
Public Schools
Rules and Regulations
Students
Diseases
Education, State Board of
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Immunization
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Health
Public Schools
Rules and Regulations
Students