MD HB1178 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting from the recordation tax and State transfer tax a purchase money mortgage or purchase money deed of trust related to a transfer from a certified community development financial institution under specified circumstances; providing for the retroactive application of the Act; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemption - Purchase Money Mortgage or Purchase Money Deed of Trust
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301 |
2015-04-13 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2015-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2015-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {330016/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2015-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-13 | House | Rereferred to Environment and Transportation |
2015-03-13 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-17 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-09 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2015-02-23 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Community Development
Deeds
Emergency Bills
Exemptions
Financial Institutions
Foreclosure
Mortgages
Recordation
Revenue and Taxes
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer
Transfer Tax
Deeds
Emergency Bills
Exemptions
Financial Institutions
Foreclosure
Mortgages
Recordation
Revenue and Taxes
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer
Transfer Tax