MD HB1177 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-21 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-21 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the secured party to petition a circuit court for leave to immediately commence an action to foreclose a mortgage or deed of trust that is the subject of the mortgage or deed of trust when the property has been destroyed, is abandoned or vacant, is not intended and has never been used for human habitation, or is intended for human habitation but has never been occupied, and a use and occupancy permit, if required, has never been issued.
Title
Residential Property - Foreclosure Process - Commencement
Sponsors
Del. Dana Stein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-21 | Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn | |
2011-03-01 | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-28 | Re-referred Environmental Matters | |
2011-02-16 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2011rs/billfile/HB1177.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2011rs/bills/hb/hb1177f.pdf |