MD HB1175 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the term of the members of the Kent County Board of Education; requiring the County Commissioners of Kent County to appoint a qualified individual to fill any vacancy on the Board; repealing provisions providing for the election of a specified candidate to fill a vacancy; requiring specified members of the Board to be elected in a specified general election; providing for the termination of the terms of elected members; etc.
Title
Kent County Board of Education - Members - Terms and Vacancies
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2010-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-09 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-04-09 | Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Colburn) Adopted | |
2010-04-09 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-09 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-12 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-27 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-04-09 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-25 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | |
2010-03-24 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-24 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-27 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2010-02-22 | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-17 | First Reading Ways and Means |