MD HB1170 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 644
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 644
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering specified residency requirements for specified business applicants for alcoholic beverages licenses in Harford County; and altering a requirement that a specified applicant for specified alcoholic beverages licenses own a specified percentage of a specified business, subject to an exception.
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Residency Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 644 |
2014-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2014-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {813796/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2014-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-07 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Associations
Corporations
Harford County
Limited Liability Companies
Partnerships
Restaurants
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Associations
Corporations
Harford County
Limited Liability Companies
Partnerships
Restaurants