MD HB117 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-17 - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-17 - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting an individual from the physical agility assessment required for certification as a police officer in the State if the individual was a certain police officer or a certain equivalent on or before January 1, 2012, and has at least 20 cumulative years of service as a police officer or a certain equivalent at the time of application for certification as a police officer.
Title
Certification of Police Officers - Physical Agility Assessment - Exemption
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-17 | House | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-11 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2022-08-17 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 3 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 3 | 209 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0117?ys=2023RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/bills/hb/hb0117f.pdf |