MD HB1169 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 436
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 436
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Health Services Cost Review Commission to establish a Community Benefit Reporting Workgroup; requiring the Commission to adopt certain regulations relating to the community health needs of nonprofit hospitals and reporting by nonprofit hospitals regarding community health needs and benefits provided by the hospital; requiring the Commission, on or before December 1, 2020, to issue a certain report to certain committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Title
Health Services Cost Review Commission – Community Benefits – Reporting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 436 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2020-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {826980/1 Adopted |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-02-14 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB774 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 437
Subjects
Auditors and Audits
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Counties
Data
Examinations
Health
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Hospitals
Nonprofit Organizations
Prices
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Taxes - Income
Taxes - Property - Local
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Counties
Data
Examinations
Health
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Hospitals
Nonprofit Organizations
Prices
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Taxes - Income
Taxes - Property - Local
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 19 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |