MD HB1165 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 450
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 450
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Correcting certain references to the Comptroller of Maryland to be the Executive Director of the Alcohol and Tobacco Commission, as appropriate; and clarifying certain powers and duties of the Executive Director of the Commission relating to alcoholic beverages regulation and enforcement.
Title
Alcohol and Tobacco Commission – Technical Corrections and Clarifications
Sponsors
Del. C.T. Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 450 |
2023-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2023-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-1) |
2023-03-18 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-18 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2023-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-10 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Business Regulation
Citations
Committees and Commissions
Investigations and Inquiries
Legislation
Tobacco and Nicotine
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Business Regulation
Citations
Committees and Commissions
Investigations and Inquiries
Legislation
Tobacco and Nicotine