MD HB1161 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB973
Note: Carry Foward to future HB858
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1109
Note: Carry Foward to future HB858
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1109
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a physician from performing or inducing an abortion on a pregnant woman within a certain period of time after the woman receives certain ultrasound imaging; and establishing certain requirements related to the performance of a certain transabdominal ultrasound; and providing that a woman is not required to accept anything offered during certain transabdominal ultrasound imaging.
Title
Health - Abortion - Ultrasound and Waiting Period
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2022-03-10 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-17 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-11 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
HB1161 (Carry Over) 2022-03-15 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
HB1161 (Carry Over) 2022-03-15 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
HB1109 (Carry Over) 2021-03-20 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
HB1161 (Carry Over) 2022-03-15 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
HB1109 (Carry Over) 2021-03-20 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Abortion
Age
Examinations
Fines
Health
Health Occupations
Penalties and Sentences
Physicians
Pregnancy
Public Health
Time
Women
Age
Examinations
Fines
Health
Health Occupations
Penalties and Sentences
Physicians
Pregnancy
Public Health
Time
Women
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 20 | 209 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 20 | 210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |