MD HB973 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1161
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-18 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-18 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a qualified provider from performing or inducing an abortion on a pregnant woman within a certain period of time after the woman receives certain ultrasound imaging; establishing certain requirements related to the performance of a certain transabdominal ultrasound; and providing that a woman is not required to accept anything offered during certain transabdominal ultrasound imaging.
Title
Health - Abortion - Ultrasound and Waiting Period
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-18 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2023-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/16 at 6:00 p.m. |
2023-03-16 | House | Hearing canceled |
2023-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/16 at 5:00 p.m. |
2023-03-16 | House | Hearing canceled |
2023-02-22 | House | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-10 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
HB1161 (Carry Over) 2022-03-15 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 20 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 20 | 209 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 20 | 210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |