MD HB1159 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing an employee to request changes in the employee's terms and conditions of employment; providing for the application of the Act to specified employers; providing for the contents of an application requesting a change in terms and conditions of employment; requiring an employee and employer to meet under specified circumstances; prohibiting an employer from interfering with, restraining, or denying specified rights; authorizing specified court-ordered relief; etc.
Title
Working Families Flexibility Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-13 | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters Withdrawn | |
2012-03-05 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-15 | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-10 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/HB1159.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/hb/hb1159f.pdf |