MD HB1158 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-07 - Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring an owner of specified residential rental property to submit certifications and affidavits to the Department of the Environment in order to maintain an exemption from lead-based paint risk reduction standards; providing that an exemption for a multifamily rental dwelling expires on October 1, 2020, unless an inspection was conducted in accordance with regulations adopted by the Department; requiring an owner of a specified residential rental property to maintain a specified copy of each affidavit; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lead Risk Reduction Standards - Maintenance of Exemptions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-2) (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-07SenateHearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-03-24SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2015-03-23HouseThird Reading Passed (137-2)
2015-03-23HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2015-03-23HouseFavorable with Amendments {550119/1 Report Adopted
2015-03-23HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2015-03-18HouseHearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-03-09HouseRereferred to Environment and Transportation
2015-02-20HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback