MD HB1157 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a court to grant an absolute divorce on the grounds of mutual consent if both parties to the divorce orally offer on the record in open court a certain settlement agreement.
Title
Grounds for Divorce - Mutual Consent - Settlement in Open Court
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn |
2018-02-21 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |