MD HB1156 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 416
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 416
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the wine festival license in Calvert County to be the beer or wine festival license; establishing that beer festivals and beer and wine festivals are subject to specified authorizations and requirements applicable to wine festivals; authorizing the Calvert County Board of License Commissioners to issue the beer or wine festival license to specified persons; authorizing the Board to approve up to 4 weekends for beer or wine festivals per applicant; etc.
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer or Wine Festival License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 416 |
2016-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-14 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2016-03-09 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-09 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-08 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2016-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Calvert County
Fairs
License Commissioners, Boards of
Retail Sales
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Calvert County
Fairs
License Commissioners, Boards of
Retail Sales