MD HB1155 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB893
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-11 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-11 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the local department of social services and the circuit court to provide notice to a child's foster parent, kinship parent, preadoptive parent, or caregiver of the right to intervene as a party in a proceeding concerning the child; extending to kinship parents certain rights granted to foster parents, preadoptive parents, and caregivers; granting to foster parents, kinship parents, preadoptive parents, and caregivers the right to intervene as a party in certain proceedings; etc.
Title
Foster Parents, Kinship Parents, Preadoptive Parents, and Caregivers – Right to Intervene
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2022-03-10 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-14 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-11 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB893 (Carry Over) 2021-02-02 - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Adoption - see also- Parents and Guardians
Caregivers
Child Abuse and Neglect
Circuit Courts
Family Law
Foster Care
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Privileged Communications
Records
Social Services
Caregivers
Child Abuse and Neglect
Circuit Courts
Family Law
Foster Care
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Privileged Communications
Records
Social Services
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 816.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 5 | 504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |