MD HB1154 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-13 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-13 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $250,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of A Step Forward, Incorporated for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, and capital equipping of housing for low-income families, located in Baltimore City; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; etc.
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Multifamily Low-Income Housing Project
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-13 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations |
2015-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/14 at 12:00 p.m. |
2015-03-04 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2015-02-20 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |