MD HB1140 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-24 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-24 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Office of Legislative Audits, on or before December 31, 2016, to complete a review that compares the ratemaking structure of the Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission with other water and sewer utilities in the State and nationally that meet specified qualifications.
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Ratemaking Structure - Review by Office of Legislative Audits PG/MC 108-16
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2016-03-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {654762/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2016-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Auditors and Audits
Bi-County Agencies
Legislative Services, Department of
Prices
Washington Suburban Sanitary District
Bi-County Agencies
Legislative Services, Department of
Prices
Washington Suburban Sanitary District