MD HB1138 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-12 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-12 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that the decisions of a county board of education regarding matters relating to the standards, curriculum, and courses of study in the public schools in their jurisdiction are final and may not be subject to further review; providing that the guidelines for the program of instruction for public schools in the State by the State Board of Education are voluntary; etc.
Title
Education - County Boards of Education - Control and Management of Public Schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-14 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Jurisdiction
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Jurisdiction
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools