MD HB1138 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Public Service Commission to authorize the use of a specified master meter for heating, ventilation, and air conditioning services in specified residential multiple occupancy buildings without requiring individual metering or submetering for heating, ventilation, and air conditioning services under specified circumstances; authorizing the Commission to review specified information before authorizing the use of a master meter; etc.
Title
Residential Multiple Occupancy Buildings - Master Meters - Heating,
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-05 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) | |
2010-04-04 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-04 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2010-03-30 | Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-27 | First Reading Finance | |
2010-04-03 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (137-2) | |
2010-04-03 | House Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2010-03-25 | Third Reading Passed (137-2) | |
2010-03-24 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-23 | Special Order next session (Delegate Carr) Adopted | |
2010-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-26 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2010-02-18 | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-17 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Apartments
Condominiums
Energy Matters
Equipment
Heating and Cooling
Housing
Inspections
Public Service Commission
Shopping Centers
Sunset
Utilities
Condominiums
Energy Matters
Equipment
Heating and Cooling
Housing
Inspections
Public Service Commission
Shopping Centers
Sunset
Utilities