MD HB1134 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a public charter school application for a public charter school located in Prince George's County to include specified information regarding whether public charter schools will provide transportation or secure a facility that is accessible to public transportation; requiring specified public charter schools to develop and implement a specified comprehensive plan; requiring specified public charter schools to submit a specified comprehensive plan to the Chief Executive Officer of Prince George's County Public Schools; etc.
Title
Equality in Education Act PG 434-16
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | House | Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn |
2016-03-08 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Education
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Mass Transit
Prince George's County
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Employees
Public Schools
Transportation
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Mass Transit
Prince George's County
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Employees
Public Schools
Transportation