MD HB1134 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that the effective date of eligible governmental units to join the State Retirement and Pension System shall be postponed to July 1 of a specified fiscal year if the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System does not receive necessary documents on or before July 1 of a specified fiscal year from the eligible governmental unit; making technical and clarifying changes to the State Personnel and Pensions Article; deleting obsolete provisions in the State Personnel and Pensions Article; etc.
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Eligible Governmental Units
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | |
2010-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-04-01 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-05 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2010-03-19 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | |
2010-03-31 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-18 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-16 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-15 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | |
2010-02-17 | Hearing 3/2 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-17 | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Correctional Officers
Counties
Law Enforcement
Municipal Corporations
Public Employees
Retirement Systems
Special Tax Districts
State Employees
Correctional Officers
Counties
Law Enforcement
Municipal Corporations
Public Employees
Retirement Systems
Special Tax Districts
State Employees