MD HB113 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Comptroller to appoint the Chief of the Bureau of Revenue Estimates from a list of candidates reviewed and evaluated by the Consensus Revenue Monitoring and Forecasting Group; requiring the Bureau to submit the March revenue report to the Board of Revenue Estimates by a date that allows the Board to meet prior to the passage of the annual budget bill in the first chamber of the General Assembly to vote on the budget bill in that year; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Board of Revenue Estimates and Bureau of Revenue Estimates - Organization and Operations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2021-01-18HouseHearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
2020-09-08HousePre-filed
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations

Same As/Similar To

SB314 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-24 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Finance and Procurement6101(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement6103(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement6104(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement6105(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement6106(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback