MD SB314 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - Referred Ways and Means Appropriations
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Comptroller to appoint the Chief of the Bureau of Revenue Estimates from a list of at least three candidates reviewed and evaluated by the Revenue Monitoring Committee and the Consensus Revenue Monitoring and Forecasting Group; requiring a certain report of estimated state revenues to be reviewed and approved by the Committee before the estimates are formally adopted; requiring the Bureau to submit the March revenue report to the Board of Revenue Estimates by a certain date; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Board of Revenue Estimates and Bureau of Revenue Estimates - Organization and Operations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-03HouseReferred Ways and Means Appropriations
2021-03-02SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2021-02-24SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-02-24SenateFavorable with Amendments {879138/1 Adopted
2021-02-24SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2021-01-11SenateHearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2020-10-27SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB113 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-05 - Third Reading Passed (105-21)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Finance and Procurement6101(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement6103(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement6104(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement6105(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement6106(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback